Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 93 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4885 Week
» 14819 Month
» 47208 Year
» 931589 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1576   05/1903
BR 31576   04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1903
Withdrawal During 11/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 56 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 08/10/1957
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 07/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1903 To Service To service as SR Number 1576
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31576    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31576    

prev prev