Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 131 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 131 Week
» 18253 Month
» 187025 Year
» 1071406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1582 m/e 06/1903
BR 31582 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/06/1958
Scrapping During 06/1958
Service Life 55 yrs , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C Hither Green 4w/e 12/05/1951
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 27/07/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 07/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 27/07/1951
WDN   w/e 07/06/1958
WDN   m/e 30/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as SR Number 1582
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31582    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 31582    

prev prev