Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 462 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2949 Week
» 15462 Month
» 103654 Year
» 988035 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1584   06/1903
BR 31584   05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/02/1962
Scrapping During 03/1962
Service Life 58 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BA Bricklayers Arms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 27/07/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 17/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 27/07/1951
WDN   w/e 17/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as SR Number 1584
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31584    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
25/02/1961 Sightings Ashford Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
17/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31584    

prev prev