Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 465 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2952 Week
» 15465 Month
» 103657 Year
» 988038 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1585   06/1903
BR 31585   07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal During 02/1959
Scrapping During 05/1959
Service Life 55 yrs , 8 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GIL Gillingham (Kent) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D Tonbridge 4w/e 06/10/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 5w/e 08/10/1951
WDN   w/e 14/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as SR Number 1585
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31585    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31585    

prev prev