|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/04/1947 | Ashford Works | During the period (1/3/47 to 3/4/47) the following locos. entered the works: 1064, 1113, 1266, 1273, 1311, 1405, 1477, 1486, 1540, 1589, 1599, 1614, 1633, 1671, 1721, 1737, 1753, 1777, 2168, 2390, 2486, 2519, 2536, 2364, W.D. 70811, 70853, 77103 and 78705. | SLS/194705 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1908 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1589 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) | ||
11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31589 | ||
27/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) | ||
06/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ashford (74A) | ||
20/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ashford (74A) | ||
11/11/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31589 | ||
12/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |