Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3420 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16826 Week
» 69842 Month
» 189369 Year
» 3216222 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1591 |
m/e |
03/1907 |
British Railways |
31591 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
Coppernobs |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 03/1907 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1955 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
73E |
Faversham |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
75B |
Redhill |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
TOSTORE |
75B |
Redhill |
5w/e |
08/10/1951 |
REINS |
75B |
Redhill |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
REINS |
75B |
Redhill |
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
REINS |
75B |
Redhill |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
75E |
Three Bridges |
6w/e |
08/02/1954 |
REINS |
75B |
Redhill |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
TOSTORE |
75E |
Three Bridges |
8w/e |
08/02/1955 |
REINS |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
11/03/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/05/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/02/1948 |
Brighton Station |
Unusual visitors to Brighton on 9/2 were Nos. 1918/20; 'W' tanks are not often seen there. Some half-dozen Eastern Section engines appear during the course of a week, especially on the through train from Sevenoaks due 8.24 a.m. (frequently an 'H' tank) and on the through from Tonbridge due 9.10 a.m. on which 'D' and 'Dl' classes appear (Nos. 1591, 1731, 1745, etc.). Otherwise the steam working is in the hands of the usual Central Section engines apart from Standard classes built since 1922, such as 'V,' 'N,' 'Ul,' and the two 'P' class tanks which are used for Kingston Wharf and shed coal stage duties |
SLS/194803 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1591 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31591 |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
08/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
11/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
11/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
06/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31591 |
|
|