Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1592 m/e 02/1902
BR 31592 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Longhedge Works
To Service During 02/1902
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Service Life 61 yrs, 4 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RAM Ramsgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73J Tonbridge 6w/e 09/02/1960
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 09/11/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 09/11/1961
LOAN DEPT   17/06/1962
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane w/e 25/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1902 To Service To service as SR Number 1592
Built at Longhedge Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31592    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31592    

prev prev