Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 464 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2951 Week
» 15464 Month
» 103656 Year
» 988037 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1593   05/1902
BR 31593   12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Longhedge Works
To Service During 05/1902
Withdrawal During 02/1958
Scrapping During 04/1958
Service Life 55 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TON Tonbridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 05/09/1951
70C Guildford 4w/e 11/12/1954
74A Ashford 6w/e 20/04/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 05/09/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 74A Ashford 8w/e 20/04/1955
WDN   w/e 08/02/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1902 To Service To service as SR Number 1593
Built at Longhedge Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31593    
05/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
11/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
20/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (74A)    
02/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 31593    

prev prev