Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 665 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14708 Week
» 79662 Month
» 282326 Year
» 3309179 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
South Eastern and Chatham Railway |
129 |
m/e |
10/1913 |
Southern Railway (1924) |
595 |
m/e |
1924 |
Southern Railway (1925) |
A595 |
m/e |
1925 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1595 |
m/e |
1931 |
British Railways |
31595 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
J |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 10/1913 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1951 |
Service Life |
37 yrs , 7 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1913 |
AFD |
|
Ashford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
05/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/04/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. |
SLS/194708 |
03/12/1948 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives recently painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30520, 30916, 31005, 31507/95, 31765/74, 31804/50/68. |
SLS/194901 |
12/05/1951 |
Ashford Works |
In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1913 |
To Service |
To service as South Eastern and Chatham Railway Number 129 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 595 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to A595 |
|
|
1931 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1595 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31595 |
|
|
05/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31595 |
|
|
07/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|