Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2876 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16282 Week
» 69298 Month
» 188825 Year
» 3215678 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1610 |
m/e |
08/1928 |
British Railways |
31610 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 08/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 30/12/1962 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75B |
Redhill |
8w/e |
13/05/1954 |
ALLOC |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
9w/e |
31/10/1954 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
27/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/01/1950 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. |
SLS/195002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1610 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31610 |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
30/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31610 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|