Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1612 |
m/e |
07/1928 |
British Railways |
31612 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 12/05/1963 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/07/1961 |
Ashford MPD (73F) (ex-works) |
On shed waiting works-31583 an 31714, ex-works-30902, 31612, 31794, 33008/22/9/30. |
SLS/196109 |
12/05/1963 |
Eastligh MPD (Waiting Works) |
Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1612 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31612 |
|
|
13/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
17/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
09/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
12/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31612 |
|
|
08/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|