Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1208 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19011 Week
» 72027 Month
» 191554 Year
» 3218407 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1620 |
m/e |
11/1928 |
British Railways |
31620 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 11/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 04/04/1965 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1951 |
Ashford Works |
In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1620 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31620 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
30/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
04/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31620 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|