Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 694 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4210 Week
» 32168 Month
» 66810 Year
» 1288375 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1626 m/e 03/1929
BR 31626 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 34 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SAL Salisbury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70C Guildford 4w/e 12/05/1951
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 24/08/1953
72C Yeovil Town 5w/e 11/03/1955
72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 13/10/1958
72C Yeovil Town w/e 11/03/1959
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 10/03/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 72B Salisbury 12/05/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 24/08/1953
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 11/03/1955
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 30/09/1958
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town q/e 12/01/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 19/11/1962
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1929 To Service To service as SR Number 1626
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31626    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
24/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
11/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31626    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev