Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1634 m/e 04/1931
BR 31634 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1931
Withdrawal w/e Sun 29/12/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAS Basingstoke 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951
70D Basingstoke 7w/e 27/06/1951
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 21/06/1955
   Withdrawn w/e 29/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE BAS Basingstoke 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC YEO Yeovil Town 3w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms w/e 21/06/1955
WDN   w/e 29/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1931 To Service To service as SR Number 1634
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Basingstoke (BAS)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31634    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31634    

prev prev