Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 1064 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5638 Week
» 33596 Month
» 68238 Year
» 1289803 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1635 m/e 04/1931
BR 31635 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1931
Withdrawal w/e Sun 01/12/1963
Scrapping During 01/1964
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951
71B Bournemouth 7w/e 27/06/1951
72B Salisbury 4w/e 06/10/1951
71A Eastleigh 6w/e 21/06/1955
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 15/06/1956
70C Guildford 6w/e 25/01/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC BAS Basingstoke 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC GFD Guildford 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 70C Guildford 5w/e 25/01/1957
WDN   w/e 01/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1931 To Service To service as SR Number 1635
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31635    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
27/07/1954 Sightings Ashford Works visit: Around the works. - On Works. RO 9/1954 Link
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
25/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31635    

prev prev