Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1638 m/e 05/1931
BR 31638 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1931
Withdrawal w/e Sun 12/01/1964
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C Hither Green 4w/e 12/05/1951
75B Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951
75A Brighton 4w/e 06/10/1951
75B Redhill 5w/e 14/02/1953
73C Hither Green 8w/e 20/07/1953
71D Fratton 4w/e 01/10/1953
70C Guildford 5w/e 26/11/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 12/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 8w/e 31/05/1947
TOSTORE 9E Nine Elms 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 9E Nine Elms 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 2w/e 12/08/1949
ALLOC FAV Faversham 5w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 75B Redhill 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 71D Fratton 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 26/11/1959
WDN   w/e 12/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1931 To Service To service as SR Number 1638
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31638    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
25/02/1961 Sightings Ashford Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31638    

prev prev