Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4812 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18855 Week
» 83809 Month
» 286473 Year
» 3313326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1665 |
m/e |
10/1891 |
British Railways |
31665 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Bob Tails |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During 10/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1952 |
Service Life |
61 yrs |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1952 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1891 |
GIL |
|
Gillingham (Kent) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
74D |
|
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
10/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
74D |
Tonbridge |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/09/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1665 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31665 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
10/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31665 |
|
|