Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 464 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2951 Week
» 15464 Month
» 103656 Year
» 988037 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1686   07/1900
BR 31686   12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 07/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/05/1962
Scrapping During 05/1962
Service Life 61 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TON Tonbridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 05/09/1951
73C Hither Green 9w/e 30/06/1952
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 09/11/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 05/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 05/09/1951
ALLOC 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 09/11/1961
WDN   w/e 05/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 1686
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31686    
05/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
05/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31686    

prev prev