Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 312 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18115 Week
» 71131 Month
» 190658 Year
» 3217511 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1688 |
m/e |
07/1900 |
British Railways |
31688 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 07/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/02/1960 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
73C |
Hither Green |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1951 |
Ashford Works |
In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1688 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31688 |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
20/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31688 |
|
|