Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 80 Today
» 806 Yesterday
» 886 Week
» 19207 Month
» 107399 Year
» 991780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1690 m/e 07/1900
BR 31690 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 07/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/06/1962
Scrapping During 07/1962
Service Life 61 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C Hither Green 9w/e 30/06/1952
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 09/11/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 23/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RAM Ramsgate 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 09/11/1961
WDN   w/e 23/06/1962
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane w/e 25/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 1690
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31690    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
23/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31690    

prev prev