Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 465 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2952 Week
» 15465 Month
» 103657 Year
» 988038 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1693   07/1900
BR 31693   09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 07/1900
Withdrawal During 06/1961
Scrapping During 06/1961
Service Life 60 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BA Bricklayers Arms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73E Faversham 4w/e 12/05/1951
73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/07/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GIL Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 03/05/1949
ALLOC GIL Gillingham (Kent) 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 08/07/1960
WDN   w/e 10/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 1693
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31693    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31693    

prev prev