Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 113 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 113 Week
» 21954 Month
» 217408 Year
» 1101789 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1694 m/e 07/1900
BR 31694 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 07/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/03/1961
Scrapping During 06/1961
Service Life 60 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/07/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 25/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HIT Hither Green 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 08/07/1960
WDN   w/e 25/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 1694
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31694    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31694    

prev prev