Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 464 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2951 Week
» 15464 Month
» 103656 Year
» 988037 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1712   12/1900
BR 31712   01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal During 02/1957
Scrapping During 04/1957
Service Life 56 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 27/07/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GIL Gillingham (Kent) 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 27/07/1951
WDN   w/e 09/02/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 1712
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 31712    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
02/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 31712    

prev prev