Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 95 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4887 Week
» 14821 Month
» 47210 Year
» 931591 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1713   12/1900
BR 31713   03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal During 04/1955
Scrapping During y/e 1955
Service Life 54 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GIL Gillingham (Kent) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 27/07/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 27/07/1951
WDN   w/e 02/04/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 1713
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31713    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
04/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 31713    

prev prev