Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 93 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4885 Week
» 14819 Month
» 47208 Year
» 931589 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1715   12/1900
BR 31715   05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal During 11/1961
Scrapping During 11/1961
Service Life 60 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FAV Faversham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951
73E Faversham 4w/e 27/07/1951
73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FAV Faversham 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC 73E Faversham 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 11/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 1715
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31715    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
27/07/1954 Sightings Ashford Works visit: Around the works. - On Works. RO 9/1954 Link
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31715    

prev prev