Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 463 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2950 Week
» 15463 Month
» 103655 Year
» 988036 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1717   01/1901
BR 31717   12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 01/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/02/1962
Scrapping During 03/1962
Service Life 61 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D Tonbridge 4w/e 27/07/1951
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 17/12/1956
73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 25/01/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 24/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 17/12/1956
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 25/01/1957
WDN   w/e 24/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1901 To Service To service as SR Number 1717
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31717    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
17/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
25/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
25/02/1961 Sightings Ashford Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
24/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31717    

prev prev