Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 129 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 129 Week
» 18251 Month
» 187023 Year
» 1071404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1719 m/e 01/1901
BR 31719 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 01/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/05/1962
Scrapping During 06/1962
Service Life 61 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 17/12/1956
73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 25/01/1957
73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 19/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 17/12/1956
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 25/01/1957
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 19/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1901 To Service To service as SR Number 1719
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31719    
17/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
25/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
19/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31719    

prev prev