Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 112 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 21953 Month
» 217407 Year
» 1101788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1720 m/e 01/1901
BR 31720 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 01/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/10/1961
Scrapping During 10/1961
Service Life 60 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HIT Hither Green 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951
73E Faversham 4w/e 08/02/1954
73E Faversham 4w/e 17/12/1956
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73H Dover Marine 6w/e 22/10/1959
73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HIT Hither Green P 01/12/1947
ALLOC 73E Faversham 6w/e 08/02/1954
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 17/12/1956
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73H Dover Marine 9w/e 22/10/1959
ALLOC 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1901 To Service To service as SR Number 1720
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31720    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
17/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
22/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (73H)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31720    

prev prev