Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 94 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4886 Week
» 14820 Month
» 47209 Year
» 931590 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1723   01/1901
BR 31723   03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 01/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/01/1962
Scrapping During 02/1962
Service Life 61 yrs , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BA Bricklayers Arms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70C Guildford 4w/e 17/12/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 27/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 17/12/1956
WDN   w/e 03/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1901 To Service To service as SR Number 1723
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31723    
17/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Scrap road.   Link
27/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31723    

prev prev