Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 289 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 16041 Month
» 104233 Year
» 988614 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1724   01/1901
BR 31724   11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 01/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/05/1962
Scrapping During 05/1962
Service Life 61 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BA Bricklayers Arms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951
75E Three Bridges 4w/e 11/12/1954
75A Brighton 5w/e 11/03/1955
73C Hither Green 6w/e 15/06/1956
75A Brighton 3w/e 17/11/1956
73C Hither Green 9w/e 12/06/1957
75A Brighton 7w/e 08/10/1957
73C Hither Green q/e 06/06/1958
73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 01/05/1959
75A Brighton 5w/e 26/11/1959
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 08/12/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 05/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 11/03/1955
TOSTORE 75A Brighton 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 31/10/1956
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 17/12/1956
ALLOC 73C Hither Green q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 75A Brighton q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 8w/e 06/06/1958
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 01/05/1959
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 26/11/1959
ALLOC 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 08/12/1961
WDN   w/e 05/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1901 To Service To service as SR Number 1724
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31724    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
11/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
11/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
01/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
05/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31724    

prev prev