Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 45 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1970 Week
» 19306 Month
» 297102 Year
» 1181483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1737 m/e 11/1901
BR 31737 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class Coppernobs
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1901
Withdrawal During 10/1956
Service Life 54 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STL St Leonards 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74B Ramsgate 4w/e 08/12/1950
73E Faversham 4w/e 05/02/1951
70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 11/04/1951
74D Tonbridge 8w/e 13/05/1954
70C Guildford 7w/e 19/12/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 74C Dover Marine 3w/e 10/06/1950
REINS 73E Faversham 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 70C Guildford 7w/e 19/12/1955
REINS 70C Guildford 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 03/11/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1901 To Service To service as SR Number 1737
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31737    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
19/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
10/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 31737    

prev prev