Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19933 Week
» 72949 Month
» 192476 Year
» 3219329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1756 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
British Railways |
31756 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1950 |
Ramblers\' Excursions |
On 9th July 1950, N. No. 31813-assisted by N. No. 31852 from Redhill, where a stop was made to attach-hauled an eleven-coach ramblers' special from Victoria to Forest Row via Three Bridges. On several occasions this year N. and U.1 class 'Moguls' have hauled crowded 11-coach ramblers' trains unaided over the Oxted line to Sheffield Park, Uckfield and Groombridge. The route of the first-named included three miles of 1 in 70 between Lingfield and East Grinstead and time was kept in all cases with gross loads of 375-400 tons. Ramblers' excursions have also been hauled over the Redhill-Shalford section-9 to 11 corridors-by classes L, L.1 and N. (31772, 31756, 31848, 31402). Judging by the pyrotechnic displays, coal consumption was not on the light side, and time was kept only by high downhill speeds on this switchback line. |
SLS/195101 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1756 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31756 |
|
|
26/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
14/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
09/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
08/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31756 |
|
|
12/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|