Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 308 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18111 Week
» 71127 Month
» 190654 Year
» 3217507 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1773 |
m/e |
06/1914 |
British Railways |
31773 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
German Engines |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Borsig (Germany) |
To Service |
During 06/1914 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/08/1959 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
74A |
Ashford |
3w/e |
10/06/1950 |
REINS |
74A |
Ashford |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
REINS |
74A |
Ashford |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
7w/e |
21/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
74A |
Ashford |
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
74D |
Tonbridge |
10w/e |
07/10/1952 |
ALLOC |
74E |
St Leonards |
q/e |
11/06/1957 |
ALLOC |
74D |
Tonbridge |
8w/e |
06/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
P |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/08/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1773 Built at Borsig (Germany) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31773 |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31773 |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|