Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2975 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16381 Week
» 69397 Month
» 188924 Year
» 3215777 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1801 |
m/e |
07/1928 |
British Railways |
31801 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 07/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 14/06/1964 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
29/12/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/06/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/06/1951 |
Brighton Works |
On 16th June, the shops contained s1, 15212, 31470, 31801, 31920, 32343, 32442, 32501/7, 32557 all under repair, remains of 32145 an 2063, while 32005 is next for scrap (possibly to be followed by 2595, which was at the shed). New 2-6-4T No. 80010 was well advanced and four more should be finished by mid-August. Boilers are numbered BR5-896 upwards and are pressed to 225lb. Now that No. 2063 is cut up, the B4 class is extinct. A small private exhibition of locomotives took place in the Works on 19th June, consisting of 42095, 34040 Crewkerne (both in spotless condition), 15227, and the almost-completed 2-6-4T 80010. On that date the diesel s1 was renumbered 15201, completing the class. |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1801 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31801 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
14/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31801 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|