Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2291 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20094 Week
» 73110 Month
» 192637 Year
» 3219490 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1807 |
m/e |
06/1928 |
British Railways |
31807 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 05/01/1964 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/01/1950 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. |
SLS/195002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1807 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
12/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
26/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31807 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
09/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
05/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31807 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|