Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 860 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 860 Week
» 12153 Month
» 276786 Year
» 1498351 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1810 m/e 06/1917
BR 31810 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1917
Withdrawal w/e Sun 29/03/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 46 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1917
BAT Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948
73H Dover Marine 6w/e 14/06/1959
71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 29/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73H Dover Marine P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 29/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/09/1963 Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1917 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1810
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31810    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
29/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31810    

prev prev