Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 50 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7791 Week
» 28233 Month
» 365079 Year
» 1586644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1811 m/e 06/1920
British Railways 31811 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1920
Withdrawal w/e Sun 04/07/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965
Service Life 45 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1920
BAT Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948
70C Guildford 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 04/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 04/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1950 Ashford Works Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1920 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1811
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31811    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
04/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 31811    

prev prev