Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 736 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 736 Week
» 12029 Month
» 276662 Year
» 1498227 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1812 m/e 08/1920
BR 31812 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1920
Withdrawal Fri 24/07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 43 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1920
BAT Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948
70C Guildford 6w/e 14/06/1959
72A Exmouth Junction on 08/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 24/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 22/06/1964
TOSTORE   3w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1950 Ramblers\' Excursion On 20th August a Ramblers' Excursion was run from Victoria to Frant, Wadhurst and Stonegate, via East Croydon, Redhill and Tonbridge. This 11-coach train was hauled throughout in the down direction by N. No. 31812, without assistance up the severe bank between Tonbridge and High Brooms. The engine made a laboured ascent at little more than walking pace. It was to have stopped at Tonbridge for pilot assistance, but owing to late running this was dispensed with. Ordinarily, of course, the N class are prohibited down the Hastings branch, which gave this working additional interest. The train was stabled in Robertsbridge sidings for the day, hence the engine did not have to go through Mountfield tunnel. On the return trip N.1 No. 31879 took the train to Tonbridge, whence N. No. 31812 was in charge to Victoria. SLS/195101
28/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1920 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1812
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31812    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31812    

prev prev