Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 673 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2012 Week
» 31510 Month
» 368356 Year
» 1589921 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1814 m/e 11/1920
British Railways 31814 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1920
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 43 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1920
NORW Norwood Junction on 01/01/1948
72B Salisbury 4w/e 01/10/1953
70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 26/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NORW Norwood Junction P 01/12/1947
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 71D Fratton 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 26/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/05/1951 Ashford Works In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1920 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1814
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31814    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
26/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31814    

prev prev