Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 806 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 806 Week
» 12099 Month
» 276732 Year
» 1498297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1815 m/e 12/1920
BR 31815 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1920
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/05/1963
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 42 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1920
RED Redhill on 01/01/1948
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 01/10/1953
73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 13/05/1954
70C Guildford 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 26/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 26/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1815
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31815    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
26/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31815    

prev prev