Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 725 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5833 Week
» 35331 Month
» 372177 Year
» 1593742 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1816 m/e 01/1922
British Railways 31816 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/01/1966
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 44 yrs , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1922
RED Redhill on 01/01/1948
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 06/10/1951
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 01/10/1953
73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 13/05/1954
70C Guildford 6w/e 14/06/1959
73C Hither Green 6w/e 22/10/1959
71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 22/07/1963
75B Redhill 4w/e 22/06/1964
70C Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 09/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 9w/e 22/10/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 22/07/1963
ALLOC 75B Redhill 8w/e 22/06/1964
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
WDN   w/e 09/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/06/1951 Brighton excursions Excursions worked in from Oxford (31899), High Wycombe (31816), Watford (45024) and Biggleswade (45300.) SLS/195108
20/01/1963 Eastleigh Works (erecting shop) In erecting shop: 4634, 31619, 31800/16/73, 33009/12, 34031/9/70, 35001/15, 41296/9, 73002/51, 76005/62, 80034/43/82/162, 82014/24, 92206. In Works yard: 30512, 31618, 34054, 35006, 41291, 80035, 82022. On scrap sidings behind Works: 30504, 30903/4, 31414, 31904, 32352. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1922 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1816
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31816    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
22/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
09/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 31816    

prev prev