|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/06/1951 | Brighton excursions | Excursions worked in from Oxford (31899), High Wycombe (31816), Watford (45024) and Biggleswade (45300.) | SLS/195108 |
20/01/1963 | Eastleigh Works (erecting shop) | In erecting shop: 4634, 31619, 31800/16/73, 33009/12, 34031/9/70, 35001/15, 41296/9, 73002/51, 76005/62, 80034/43/82/162, 82014/24, 92206. In Works yard: 30512, 31618, 34054, 35006, 41291, 80035, 82022. On scrap sidings behind Works: 30504, 30903/4, 31414, 31904, 32352. | SLS/196303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1922 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1816 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED) | ||
01/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) | ||
01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31816 | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) | ||
08/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) | ||
01/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
13/05/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
22/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) | ||
26/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
22/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) | ||
22/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
18/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
09/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31816 | ||
04/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |