Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 308 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7378 Week
» 4486 Month
» 111432 Year
» 1332997 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1818 m/e 03/1922
BR 31818 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sun 01/09/1963
Scrapping During 09/1963
Service Life 41 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RED Redhill 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 27/07/1951
73J Tonbridge m/e 10/02/1961
71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 01/02/1962
75D Stewarts Lane 2w/e 31/08/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 01/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 04/03/1950
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 01/02/1962
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 31/08/1963
WDN   w/e 01/09/1963
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 16/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1922 To Service To service as SR Number 1818
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31818    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
01/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31818    

prev prev