Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 764 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2103 Week
» 31601 Month
» 368447 Year
» 1590012 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1821 m/e 10/1922
British Railways 31821 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 10/1922
Withdrawal Thu 14/05/1964
Scrapping During 10/1964
Service Life 41 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1922
DOV Dover Marine on 01/01/1948
75C Norwood Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
75A Brighton 5w/e 06/07/1961
70C Guildford m/e 08/12/1961
72A Exmouth Junction on 08/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 14/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 75A Brighton 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 08/12/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   on 14/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1922 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1821
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31821    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
06/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
14/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31821    

prev prev