Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 740 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2079 Week
» 31577 Month
» 368423 Year
» 1589988 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1823 m/e 08/1923
British Railways 31823 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1923
Withdrawal w/e Sun 15/09/1963
Scrapping During 01/1964
Service Life 40 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1923
DOV Dover Marine on 01/01/1948
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 27/07/1951
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 08/07/1960
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 22/07/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1963
75B Redhill 4w/e 16/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 08/07/1960
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 22/07/1963
WDN   w/e 15/09/1963
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 16/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1923 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1823
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31823    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
15/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31823    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    

prev prev