Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 43 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7784 Week
» 28226 Month
» 365072 Year
» 1586637 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1824 m/e 12/1923
British Railways 31824 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1923
Withdrawal w/e Sun 20/10/1963
Scrapping During 01/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1923
BA Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 08/07/1960
75B Redhill 4w/e 22/07/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 20/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 08/07/1960
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 22/07/1963
WDN   w/e 20/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1923 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1824
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31824    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
20/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31824    

prev prev