Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 683 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2022 Week
» 31520 Month
» 368366 Year
» 1589931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1825 m/e 06/1924
British Railways 31825 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1924
Withdrawal During 09/1963
Scrapping During 01/1964
Service Life 39 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1924
BA Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948
75D Stewarts Lane 5w/e 02/07/1962
75B Redhill 4w/e 19/08/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 16/06/1962
ALLOC 75B Redhill 8w/e 19/08/1963
WDN   w/e 25/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012
02/02/1951 Eastbourne accident On 2nd February the 6.40 p.m. Eastbourne-Polegate freight train, double-headed with No. 32543 piloting No. 42074, on leaving Eastbourne yard was routed in error on to the shed road, instead of the main line. Neither crew was aware of the error, though the guard of the train (20 vehicles and brake) detected it as he promptly applied his brake, vigorously but ineffectively. Standing at the water column were s1825 (Class N) and 42075, and a heavy collision occurred involving the four engines. Another loco, No. 32434, was following, and in danger of colliding with the train already involved, but rapid action by the guard already mentioned prevented further impact. No derailment occurred, but damage to buffer-beams, draw-gear, etc., was sustained by all four locos. Several days later the two tanks left for Brighton and the tender engines for Ashford. SLS/195103
05/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583.
No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks.
SLS/195104
28/03/1951 Ashford Works In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108
06/11/1959 Southern Region floods 4th-6/11/1959. Unique in that on the second day (Sat., Nov. 5th) as far as possible a half-hourly service was operated such as only scheduled or attempted with electric multiple-units introduced in 1935, was the emergency steam working between Brighton and Eastbourne calling at intermediate stations, on account of severe flooding through the two-sided junction station at the county town, Lewes, necessitating withdrawal of all electric trains for 2 or more days on the Brighton side; for more than a week on the Haywards Heath-London side. It was not possible for the steam locOrnotives as a rule to keep intermediate timings but it was a great effort by all concerned over steep gradients 'twixt Lewes and Brighton under hazardous conditions, for instance. Saturday loads were 4-5 bogies though on Friday with fewer trains up to 8-9 modern coaches were hauled on some trips presenting a tough proposition as the engines were of a mixed character with crews hastily gathered together. Some complete outfits were from the Brighton-Uckfield (Tunbridge Wells) route closed temporarily by other flooding. Mr. S. C. Nash kindly supplied the following list of locomotives sharing in the handling of the emergency passenger service, Nov. 4th-6th :- Tender: 34098 'West Country'; 30546, 'Q', 31686, 31724, 'C', 0-6-0s; 31825, 'N', 31902/7, 'Ul', 32337/41-2, 'K' ex-L.B.S.C.R., 2.6-0s; 75075, B.R. class 4 4-6-0. Tank: 30053/6 'M7' ex-L.S.W.R. motor fitted, also partly on Seaford branch; 80032/81/146/7/52-4, B.R. class 4 2-6-4T. There were also part time two Hastings-London 6-car diesel-electric sets having greater accelerative capacity. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1825
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 31825    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
19/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31825    

prev prev