Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 68 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7809 Week
» 28251 Month
» 365097 Year
» 1586662 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1826 m/e 05/1924
British Railways 31826 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1924
Withdrawal During 09/1963
Scrapping During 01/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1924
BA Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948
75D Stewarts Lane 5w/e 02/07/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 16/06/1962
WDN   w/e 25/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1947 Brighton Works : No. 21C156 Croydon and 'Austerity' 77122 have just been through shops; the former has the new pattern cab and longer deflector plates. Engines in shops in mid-November were 21C126 (new deflectors and old cab-off 21C156), 21C170 Manston fully painted), 680S, 1414, 1826/80, 2022, 2039 Hartland Point, 2083/9, 2153, 2339/66, 2436/43/55/62/89/90, 2523/46/75. For the first time for many months the shops are without an 'Austerity' and old Brighton types preponderate. It is interesting to point out that the name Croydon was borne by Rennie's 0-4-2 of 1838 (London and Croydon Ry. No. 2), but apart from this engine-which became S.E.R. No. 2 as from 31/1/1846-three engines of this name have been seen on Brighton metals as follows: Craven's 2-2-2 No. 128 which was commenced by Dodds & Son of Rotherham in 1866 and finished off at Brighton Works in June, 1871, and named Croydon by Mr. Stroudley: scrapped in 1888. Stroudley's 0-4-2 No. 181, built at Brighton (estd. Works No. 463), completed early in 1890 by R. J. Billinton, and scrapped in 1929. Bulleid's 'West Country' Class No. 21C156, completed in February, 1947, and modified in November to the 'Battle of Britain' Class (estd. Works No. 1004). SLS/194712
30/04/1949 Brighton Works A reconditioned boiler (BE.926) has arrived at Brighton for 'H.1' class locomotive No. 32037 Selsey Bill, now undergoing heavy repair. No. 34065 Hurricane ('B.O.B.' Class) which was about to leave the works in the experimental light green livery, has been repainted in the old S.R. livery with yellow bands. Re-numbered at Brighton: Nos. 32023/30 (6/4); No. 34008 Padstow (8/4); Nos. 32113 an 90527 (ex 77056) (11/4); 32525 an 34009 Lyme Regis (13/4). No. 32151, ex Eastleigh Works, was noted lined out at Brighton shed on 10/4 and on 20/4 No. 31826 was observed here in the same style. SLS/194905
05/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583.
No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks.
SLS/195104
28/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1826
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31826    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31826    

prev prev