Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 716 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 716 Week
» 12009 Month
» 276642 Year
» 1498207 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1827 m/e 06/1924
BR 31827 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/06/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 40 yrs , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1924
ELH Eastleigh on 01/01/1948
75D Stewarts Lane 5w/e 02/07/1962
75B Redhill 4w/e 16/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 14/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 16/06/1962
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 19/11/1962
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 14/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1827
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31827    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
14/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31827    

prev prev