Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 703 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2042 Week
» 31540 Month
» 368386 Year
» 1589951 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1828 m/e 07/1924
British Railways 31828 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sun 06/09/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964
Service Life 40 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1924
EXJ Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/11/1950
73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951
75A Brighton 5w/e 02/07/1962
75B Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 06/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 06/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909
25/02/1962 Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1828
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31828    
13/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
06/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31828    

prev prev